House | 04/24/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | File Number 296 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 206 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |