House | 06/06/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Public Act 13-112 | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 589 | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | File Number 663 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Calendar Number 456 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |