House
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Public Act 13-199
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 612
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 664
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Calendar Number 457
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 04/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|