House | 04/23/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | File Number 90 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | House Calendar Number 88 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |