House
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Public Act 13-200
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
File Number 853
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 645
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7230
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
File Number 92
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
House Calendar Number 90
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|