House | 04/03/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | File Number 135 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | House Calendar Number 117 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |