House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-44
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
File Number 757
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 525
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6390
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6089
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
File Number 136
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
House Calendar Number 118
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|