House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |