House | 03/12/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |