House | 05/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Public Act 13-45 | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7221 | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7102 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 335 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | File Number 138 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | House Calendar Number 120 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |