House | 06/06/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Public Act 13-115 | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 600 | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | No New File by Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | File Number 297 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 207 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |