House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Public Act 13-116
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
File Number 476
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 358
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5558
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
File Number 298
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
House Calendar Number 208
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|