House | 05/20/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Public Act 13-9 | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 353 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 220 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 163 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |