House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 222 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 165 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |