Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06499 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/25/2013

                            General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 6499
January Session, 2013  *_____HB06499ED____042413____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 6499 

January Session, 2013

*_____HB06499ED____042413____*

AN ACT CONCERNING CHILDREN'S RIGHTS AND THE RESULTS-BASED ACCOUNTABILITY ASSESSMENT PROGRAM. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2013) (a) For purposes of this act, the "United Nations Convention on the Rights of the Child" or "convention" means the convention adopted by the United Nations General Assembly on November 20, 1989, since ratified by one hundred ninety-three nations, that represents the first international instrument to address the civil, political, economic, social and cultural rights of children.

(b) On or before January 15, 2014, the chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children shall form a working group comprised of representatives of state agencies and departments, community organizations, private provider agencies operating programs that impact the well-being of children and families, parents and other caretakers of children, child advocacy organizations, health care professionals that serve children and families, schools, and child care providers. Such working group shall: (1) Receive reports and testimony from individuals, state and local agencies, community-based organizations and other public and private organizations regarding the United Nations Convention on the Rights of the Child; (2) create goals for state policy that would prevent the abuse of children's rights in the state; (3) implement results-based accountability measures to track progress towards the goals and objectives outlined in the convention for inclusion in the children's results-based accountability report card established pursuant to section 2-53m of the general statutes; and (4) urge the United States Congress to ratify the convention so the United States may join the one hundred ninety-three nations having already ratified the convention. 

(c) Not later than January 15, 2015, the working group shall submit a report detailing the working group's findings pursuant to subsection (b) of this section to the General Assembly, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes.

(d) The working group shall terminate on January 15, 2015.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2013 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2013

New section

 

KID Joint Favorable Subst.
ED Joint Favorable

KID

Joint Favorable Subst.

ED

Joint Favorable