House | 05/01/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | File Number 461 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | House Calendar Number 297 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |