House | 04/24/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | File Number 549 | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | House Calendar Number 345 | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |