House | 06/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/11/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Public Act 13-144 | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 559 | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | File Number 689 | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 472 | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |