House
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2013
|
Public Act 13-182
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8544
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 613
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 667
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Calendar Number 460
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|