House
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-293
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
File Number 643
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 467
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6150
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
File Number 369
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
House Calendar Number 249
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|