House
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-294
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
File Number 786
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 557
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6363
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 631
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Calendar Number 419
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|