House | 04/18/2013 | File Number 576 | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | House Calendar Number 362 | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |