House | 06/21/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/11/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Public Act 13-146 | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 573 | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | File Number 370 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 250 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |