Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06535 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6535
22 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 3797
33 *03797_______ET_*
44 Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
55 Introduced by:
66 (ET)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 6535
1111
1212 January Session, 2013
1313
1414 LCO No. 3797
1515
1616 *03797_______ET_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (ET)
2323
2424 AN ACT REDEFINING CLASS I RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subdivision (26) of subsection (a) of section 16-1 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
2929
3030 (26) "Class I renewable energy source" means (A) energy derived from solar power, wind power, a fuel cell, methane gas from landfills, anaerobic digestion of organic waste, ocean thermal power, wave or tidal power, low emission advanced renewable energy conversion technologies, a run-of-the-river hydropower facility provided such facility has a generating capacity of not more than five megawatts, does not cause an appreciable change in the river flow, and began operation after July 1, 2003, or a sustainable biomass facility with an average emission rate of equal to or less than .075 pounds of nitrogen oxides per million BTU of heat input for the previous calendar quarter, except that energy derived from a sustainable biomass facility with a capacity of less than five hundred kilowatts that began construction before July 1, 2003, may be considered a Class I renewable energy source, [or] (B) any electrical generation, including distributed generation, generated from a Class I renewable energy source, or (C) useful thermal energy derived from a Class I renewable energy source under subparagraph (A) of this subdivision, cogeneration technology, methane gas from anaerobic digesters, geothermal or air source heating and cooling equipment or biodiesel or renewable diesel blend;
3131
3232 Sec. 2. Subdivision (45) of subsection (a) of section 16-1 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
3333
3434 (45) "Sustainable biomass" means biomass that is cultivated and harvested in a sustainable manner. "Sustainable biomass" does not mean construction and demolition waste, as defined in section 22a-208x, finished biomass products from sawmills, paper mills or stud mills, organic refuse fuel derived separately from municipal solid waste, or biomass from old growth timber stands, except where (A) such biomass is used in a biomass gasification plant that received funding prior to May 1, 2006, from the Clean Energy Fund established pursuant to section 16-245n, or (B) the energy derived from such biomass is subject to a long-term power purchase contract pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (j) of section 16-244c entered into prior to May 1, 2006, (C) such biomass is used in a renewable energy facility [that is certified as a Class I renewable energy source by the authority until such time as the authority certifies that any biomass gasification plant, as defined in subparagraph (A) of this subdivision, is operational and accepting such biomass,] in an amount not to exceed one hundred forty thousand tons annually, [is used in a renewable energy facility] that was certified as a Class I renewable energy source by the authority prior to December 31, 2007, and uses biomass, including construction and demolition waste as defined in section 22a-208x, from a Connecticut-sited transfer station and volume-reduction facility that generated biomass during calendar year 2007 that was used during calendar year 2007 to generate Class I renewable energy certificates, or (D) in the event there is no facility as described in subparagraph (A) or (C) of this subdivision accepting such biomass, in an amount not to exceed one hundred forty thousand tons annually, is used in one or more other renewable energy facilities certified either as a Class I or Class II renewable energy source by the authority, provided such facilities use biomass, including construction and demolition waste as defined in said section 22a-208x, from a Connecticut-sited transfer station and volume-reduction facility that generated biomass during calendar year 2007 that was used during calendar year 2007 to generate Class I renewable energy certificates. Notwithstanding the provisions of subparagraphs (C) and (D) of this subdivision, the amount of biomass specified in said subparagraphs shall not apply to a biomass gasification plant, as defined in subparagraph (A) of this subdivision;
3535
3636 Sec. 3. Subsection (a) of section 16-1 of the general statutes is amended by adding subdivision (53) as follows (Effective from passage):
3737
3838 (NEW) (53) "Useful thermal energy" means energy in the form of direct heat, steam, hot water or other thermal form that is used by a facility located in the state of Connecticut for heating, cooling, humidity control, process use or other valid thermal end use energy requirements, for which fuel or electricity would otherwise be consumed.
3939
4040 Sec. 4. Subsection (b) of section 16-245a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
4141
4242 (b) An electric supplier or electric distribution company may satisfy the requirements of this section (1) by purchasing certificates issued by the New England Power Pool Generation Information System, provided the certificates are for (A) energy produced by a generating unit using Class I or Class II renewable energy sources and the generating unit is located in the jurisdiction of the regional independent system operator, [or] (B) energy imported into the control area of the regional independent system operator pursuant to New England Power Pool Generation Information System Rule 2.7(c), as in effect on January 1, 2006, or (C) useful thermal energy that is metered and reported by an approved independent monitor; (2) for those renewable energy certificates under contract to serve end-use customers in the state on or before October 1, 2006, by participating in a renewable energy trading program within said jurisdictions as approved by the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority; or (3) by purchasing eligible renewable electricity and associated attributes from residential customers who are net producers.
4343
4444 Sec. 5. Section 16-245a of the general statutes is amended by adding subsection (h) as follows (Effective from passage):
4545
4646 (NEW) (h) On or before July 1, 2013, the authority shall initiate a contested case proceeding to determine the specific guidelines by which a facility utilizing useful thermal energy would qualify as a Class I renewable energy source. Such guidelines shall include: (1) Unit eligibility requirements, including emissions thresholds and metering standards, (2) monitoring and verification standards, including the required qualifications to be certified as an independent monitor, and (3) calculation and creation of renewable energy certificates.
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5252 Section 1 from passage 16-1(a)(26)
5353 Sec. 2 from passage 16-1(a)(45)
5454 Sec. 3 from passage 16-1(a)
5555 Sec. 4 from passage 16-245a(b)
5656 Sec. 5 from passage 16-245a
5757
5858 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5959
6060 Section 1
6161
6262 from passage
6363
6464 16-1(a)(26)
6565
6666 Sec. 2
6767
6868 from passage
6969
7070 16-1(a)(45)
7171
7272 Sec. 3
7373
7474 from passage
7575
7676 16-1(a)
7777
7878 Sec. 4
7979
8080 from passage
8181
8282 16-245a(b)
8383
8484 Sec. 5
8585
8686 from passage
8787
8888 16-245a
8989
9090 Statement of Purpose:
9191
9292 To add anaerobic digestion of organic waste and useful thermal energy to the definition of Class I renewable energy source and to expand the definition of sustainable biomass.
9393
9494 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]