House
|
05/09/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 560
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6507
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
File Number 507
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 324
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|