House | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Public Act 13-27 | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 461 | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | File Number 371 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 251 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |