House
|
05/22/2013
|
File Number 840
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 632
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7296
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
File Number 781
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House Calendar Number 540
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|