House | 04/17/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | File Number 305 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 215 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |