House
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Special Act 13-13
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
File Number 819
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 604
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6910
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
File Number 233
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
House Calendar Number 176
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|