House | 04/22/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | File Number 373 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 253 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |