House | 05/27/2013 | File Number 864 | ||
House | 05/27/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 654 | ||
House | 05/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7654 | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | File Number 95 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | House Calendar Number 93 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |