House
|
06/20/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Public Act 13-121
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
File Number 795
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 575
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5804
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
File Number 509
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 326
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|