House
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Public Act 13-150
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 605
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
File Number 587
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
House Calendar Number 402
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|