House | 05/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Public Act 13-28 | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 508 | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | File Number 633 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | House Calendar Number 421 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |