Senate | 05/31/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 681 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | File Number 722 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | House Calendar Number 502 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |