House | 05/23/2013 | File Number 849 | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 641 | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7459 | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7431 | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | File Number 690 | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 473 | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |