House
|
07/02/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2013
|
Public Act 13-236
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8869
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
File Number 886
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 682
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8113
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
File Number 578
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
House Calendar Number 364
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|