House | 04/23/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | File Number 375 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 255 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |