Senate | 04/01/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Special Act 13-1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Emergency Certification |