Senate
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Special Act 13-21
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 485
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
File Number 588
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
House Calendar Number 403
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|