Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
File Number 893
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 691
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8191
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
File Number 552
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 351
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|