House
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Special Act 13-22
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
File Number 876
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 669
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7861
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
File Number 553
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 346
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|