House | 05/14/2013 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 236 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 179 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |