House | 06/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/13/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/11/2013 | Public Act 13-206 | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 459 | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | File Number 468 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | House Calendar Number 304 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |