Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 701
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B,C
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8727
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8721
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8698
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
File Number 581
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
House Calendar Number 366
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|