House | 04/15/2013 | File Number 512 | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 329 | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |