House | 05/13/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 585 | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | File Number 635 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | House Calendar Number 423 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |