House | 07/12/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/20/2013 | Public Act 13-296 | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 503 | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | File Number 514 | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 331 | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |