Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 700
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8652
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 669
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Calendar Number 462
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|