House
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Public Act 13-154
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
File Number 827
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 615
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 7046
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7037
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 6457
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
File Number 692
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Calendar Number 475
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 04/01
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|